PA HB1232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Act No. 54
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for establishment of Statewide toll-free telephone number, for disposition and expunction of unfounded reports and general protective services reports, for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents, for volunteers having contact with children and for mandatory reporting of children under one year of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In child protective services, further providing for establishment of Statewide toll-free telephone number, for disposition and expunction of unfounded reports and general protective services reports, for employees having contact with children and adoptive and foster parents, for volunteers having contact with children and for mandatory reporting of children under one year of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1232 PN 3782, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1232 PN 3782, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1232 PN 2194, FP (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1232 PN 1459, 2017 A2191, DELISSIO (Y: 194 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1232 PN 1459, 2017 A1985, MURT (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28HouseAct No. 54
2018-06-28HouseApproved by the Governor
2018-06-22HousePresented to the Governor
2018-06-22HouseSigned in Senate
2018-06-22HouseSigned in House
2018-06-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-06-22HouseReferred to RULES
2018-06-21HouseIn the House
2018-06-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-20SenateAmended on third consideration
2018-06-18SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-05-22SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-22SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-24SenateReported as amended
2017-07-14SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2017-07-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-0)
2017-07-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-13HouseReported as committed
2017-04-17HouseReferred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1232
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1232&pn=1459
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1232&pn=2194
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1232&pn=3432
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1232&pn=3782
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=48&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=597
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=598
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2017&RollCallId=811
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=631
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=04/24/2018&RollCallId=810
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/18/2018&RollCallId=982
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=582
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1832
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1426

Bill Comments

feedback