PA HB1224 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 104, from the southern border of the Borough of Middleburg to the northern border of the Borough of Middleburg, Snyder County, as the Chief of Police Tony M. Jordan Memorial Highway.
Title
Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 104, from the southern border of the Borough of Middleburg to the northern border of the Borough of Middleburg, Snyder County, as the Chief of Police Tony M. Jordan Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1224 PN 1289, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1224 PN 1289, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Re-committed to TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-09-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-09-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |