PA HB1224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 28, 1937 (P.L.417, No.105), known as the Milk Marketing Law, in purpose, short title and definitions, further providing for definitions and construction; in general powers of the board, providing for coordination with Department of Revenue; and, in prices of milk, further providing for cooperatives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In purpose, short title and definitions, further providing for definitions and construction; in general powers of the board, providing for coordination with Department of Revenue; and, in prices of milk, further providing for cooperatives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1224 PN 1464, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-26SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2019-12-17SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-12-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-16HouseSecond consideration
2019-12-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-23HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-23HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-23HouseReported as committed
2019-04-17HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback