PA HB1224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 28, 1937 (P.L.417, No.105), known as the Milk Marketing Law, in purpose, short title and definitions, further providing for definitions and construction; in general powers of the board, providing for coordination with Department of Revenue; and, in prices of milk, further providing for cooperatives.
Title
In purpose, short title and definitions, further providing for definitions and construction; in general powers of the board, providing for coordination with Department of Revenue; and, in prices of milk, further providing for cooperatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1224 PN 1464, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1224 PN 1464, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |