PA HB122 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-08 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, providing for tuition account program; and, in Pennsylvania Uniform Transfers to Minors Act, further providing for court authorization of a transfer.
Title
In minors, providing for tuition account program; and, in Pennsylvania Uniform Transfers to Minors Act, further providing for court authorization of a transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 1321, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 1321, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-05-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2015-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-05 | House | Second consideration |
2015-05-04 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |