PA HB1201 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Re-committed to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
Pending: Senate Communications & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for consumer data privacy, for duties of controllers and for duties of processors; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for consumer data privacy, for duties of controllers and for duties of processors; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Adopt Amendment A05190 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Communications And Technology: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1201 PN 2442, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 139 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1201 PN 2315, 2023 A3094 (Y: 201 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended A02979 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-15 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A02979 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-07-02SenateRe-committed to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
2024-06-27SenateSecond consideration
2024-06-26SenateFirst consideration
2024-06-26SenateReported as amended
2024-04-04SenateReferred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
2024-03-18SenateIn the Senate
2024-03-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (139-62)
2024-03-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-12-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-12-13HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2023-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2023-11-15HouseLaid on the table
2023-11-15HouseFirst consideration
2023-11-15HouseReported as amended
2023-05-19HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1201
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1201&pn=1272
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1201&pn=2315
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1201&pn=2442
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1201&pn=3394
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1201&pn=1272&aYear=2023&an=02979
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1201&pn=2315&aYear=2023&an=03094
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1201&pn=2442&aYear=2023&an=05190
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1201P2442.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=11/15/2023&RollCallId=1127
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=11/15/2023&RollCallId=1126
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=11/15/2023&RollCallId=1128
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=814
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=867
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=03/18/2024&RollCallId=1351
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=5&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=1107
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=5&theDate=06/26/2024&RollCallId=1106

Bill Comments

feedback