PA HB120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the Keystone Solvency Operating Study Commission and providing for its powers and duties and for a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Keystone Solvency Operating Study Commission and providing for its powers and duties and for a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Floor: HB 120 PN 1154, FP (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 120 PN 87, 2021 A128, RYAN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-04-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (113-88)
2021-04-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-06HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=120
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0120&pn=0087
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0120&pn=1154
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0120P1154.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=219
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=123
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=146
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/07/2021&RollCallId=281

Bill Comments 750

feedback