PA HB1197 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in inchoate crimes, further providing for the offense of corrupt organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In inchoate crimes, further providing for the offense of corrupt organizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1197 PN 3471, FP (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A06880 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2018-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (175-0)
2018-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2018-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-01HouseReported as amended
2017-04-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1197
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1197&pn=1414
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1197&pn=3471
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1497
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1499
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1261
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2018&RollCallId=1564

Bill Comments

feedback