PA HB1189 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 28-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-10-10 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, providing for optional property tax elimination.
Title
Providing for optional property tax elimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-02 - House - HB 1189 PN 2427, FP (Y: 149 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-10-02 - House - HB 1189 PN 2427, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 174 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 131 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, 2013 A3501, GROVE (Y: 192 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, 2013 A3448, COX (Y: 59 N: 138 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2013-10-02 - House - HB 1189 PN 2427, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, TURZAI (Y: 174 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, AGREE TO ON, SECOND CONSIDERATION (Y: 131 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, 2013 A3501, GROVE (Y: 192 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - House - HB 1189 PN 2355, 2013 A3448, COX (Y: 59 N: 138 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-10-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-10-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (149-46) |
2013-10-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-10-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-10-01 | House | Second consideration, with amendments (131-66) |
2013-09-24 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | First consideration |
2013-09-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to FINANCE |