PA HB1187 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 5 (Athletics and Sports) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for duties of State Athletic Commission; in regulation of boxing contests and exhibitions, further providing for age of participants, for gloves and for contracts; in wrestling, further providing for definitions and for physician to be in attendance; and, in registration of athlete agents, further providing for penalties and for bonding requirements.
Title
Further providing for duties of State Athletic Commission; in regulation of boxing contests and exhibitions, further providing for age of participants, for gloves and for contracts; in wrestling, further providing for definitions and for physician to be in attendance; and, in registration of athlete agents, further providing for penalties and for bonding requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-21 - House - HB 1187 PN 2374, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-13 | First consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-23 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2009-07-21 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-21 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-06 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-06 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-02 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-02 | First consideration | |
2009-07-02 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |