PA HB1185 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in property and waters, further providing for the offense of damage to property; in protection of property and waters, further providing for the offense of littering; in fishing licenses, further providing for form and expiration of licenses; in preliminary provisions relating to boats and boating, further providing for boating education; and, in operation of boats, further providing for the offense of operating watercraft under influence of alcohol or controlled substance and providing for the offense of aggravated assault by watercraft.
Title
In property and waters, further providing for the offense of damage to property; in protection of property and waters, further providing for the offense of littering; in fishing licenses, further providing for form and expiration of licenses; in preliminary provisions relating to boats and boating, further providing for boating education; and, in operation of boats, further providing for the offense of operating watercraft under influence of alcohol or controlled substance and providing for the offense of aggravated assault by watercraft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1185 PN 3862, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1185 PN 3862, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1185 PN 1371, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1185 PN 3862, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1185 PN 3862, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1185 PN 1371, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Act No. 40 |
2020-07-01 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed in Senate |
2020-06-24 | House | Signed in House |
2020-06-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0) |
2020-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2020-06-24 | House | Referred to RULES |
2020-06-23 | House | In the House |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2019-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |