PA HB1184 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-14 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in general budget implementation, providing for block grants and further providing for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.
Title
In general budget implementation, providing for block grants and further providing for Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-14 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |