PA HB1181 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to grant and convey to Alexander Delmont Bard and Melissa Marie Bard, certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Pittsburgh, Allegheny County.
Title
Authorizing the Department of General Services, with the approval of the Department of Corrections and the Governor, to grant and convey to Alexander Delmont Bard and Melissa Marie Bard, certain lands and improvements situate in the City of Pittsburgh, Allegheny County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-15 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |