PA HB118 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the final disposition of fetal remains; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the final disposition of fetal remains; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 118 PN 2521, Motion to Remove from the Table (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 118 PN 2521, Motion to Table (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Adopt Amendment A03146 (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 1724, FP (Y: 118 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 86, 2021 A140, FIEDLER (Y: 87 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 86, 2021 A138, DALEY (Y: 91 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 86, 2021 A139, CEPHAS (Y: 90 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 86, 2021 A1451, RYAN (Y: 123 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-29SenateRemoved from table
2022-06-29SenateLaid on the table
2022-06-28SenateSecond consideration
2022-06-06SenateRemoved from table
2022-06-06SenateLaid on the table
2022-03-30SenateRemoved from table
2022-03-30SenateLaid on the table
2021-12-14SenateFirst consideration
2021-12-14SenateReported as amended
2021-06-11SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (118-83)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-08HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-05-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-25HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=118
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0118&pn=0086
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0118&pn=1724
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0118&pn=2521
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0118P1724.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=462
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=282
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=283
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=284
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=285
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=590
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=318
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=12/14/2021&RollCallId=697
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=12/14/2021&RollCallId=696
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=613
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=620

Bill Comments

feedback