PA HB118 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, implementing the 2017-2018 Commonwealth budget and instituting future budget implementation: further providing for title of act; in administrative organization, providing for employees with access to Federal tax information; in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Health, for Department of Labor and Industry and for Pennsylvania State Police; in powers and duties of the Department of Justice and its departmental administrative boards, providing for collections by Attorney general; in powers and duties of Department of Corrections, providing for notice of public hearing for State correctional institution closure; in powers and duties of Department of Education and its departmental administrative boards and commissions, providing for Higher Education Regulatory Restricted Account; providing for Joint Underwriting Association; in powers and duties of Department of Environmental Protection, its officers and departmental and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for Environmental Quality Board and for municipal recycling grants and providing for water treatment facilities; providing for powers and duties of Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; in powers and duties of Department of Health and its departmental administrative and advisory boards, providing for Emergency Drug and Alcohol Detoxification Program; in Department of Aging, providing for PACE and PACENET program payments and for older adult daily living centers; in powers and duties of Department of Human Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for child protective services fees; providing for jail facilities; in powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission, providing for alternative energy portfolio standards; providing for judicial administration; and making related repeals.
Title
Implementing the 2017-2018 Commonwealth budget and instituting future budget implementation: further providing for title of act; in administrative organization, providing for employees with access to Federal tax information; in organization of independent administrative boards and commissions, providing for Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; in Commonwealth agency fees, further providing for Department of Health, for Department of Labor and Industry and for Pennsylvania State Police; in powers and duties of the Department of Justice and its departmental administrative boards, providing for collections by Attorney general; in powers and duties of Department of Corrections, providing for notice of public hearing for State correctional institution closure; in powers and duties of Department of Education and its departmental administrative boards and commissions, providing for Higher Education Regulatory Restricted Account; providing for Joint Underwriting Association; in powers and duties of Department of Environmental Protection, its officers and departmental and advisory boards and commissions, further providing for Environmental Quality Board and for municipal recycling grants and providing for water treatment facilities; providing for powers and duties of Department of Conservation and Natural Resources; in powers and duties of Department of Health and its departmental administrative and advisory boards, providing for Emergency Drug and Alcohol Detoxification Program; in Department of Aging, providing for PACE and PACENET program payments and for older adult daily living centers; in powers and duties of Department of Human Services and its departmental administrative and advisory boards and commissions, providing for child protective services fees; providing for jail facilities; in powers and duties of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission, providing for alternative energy portfolio standards; providing for judicial administration; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 2256, CONCUR (Y: 104 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 118 PN 2256, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 244, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 2256, CONCUR (Y: 104 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-07-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 118 PN 2256, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-26 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Floor: HB 118 PN 244, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | House | Act No. 40 |
2017-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-24 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-23 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-18 | House | Signed in House |
2017-10-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (104-86) |
2017-10-18 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-09-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-07-27 | House | In the House |
2017-07-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (37-13) |
2017-07-26 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2017-05-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-08 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-26 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-19 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to HEALTH |