PA HB1177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Transportation Reinvestment and Improvement Program and Transportation Reinvestment and Improvement Program Fund; and providing for transfers.
Title
Establishing the Transportation Reinvestment and Improvement Program and Transportation Reinvestment and Improvement Program Fund; and providing for transfers.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Sen. Greg Rothman [R] | Rep. Michael Peifer [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |