PA HB1176 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for a concussion protocol to protect law enforcement officers in Pennsylvania.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a concussion protocol to protect law enforcement officers in Pennsylvania.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1176 PN 1529, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2017-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as committed
2017-04-24HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback