PA HB1175 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Act No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in lobbying disclosure, further providing for definitions, for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities, for administration, for penalties and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Title
In lobbying disclosure, further providing for definitions, for registration, for reporting, for prohibited activities, for administration, for penalties and for registration fees, fund established, system and regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 2801, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1175 PN 2801, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 2201, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A1218, NEUMAN (Y: 98 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A2376, CUTLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 2801, CONCUR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-12-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1175 PN 2801, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 2201, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A1218, NEUMAN (Y: 98 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1175 PN 1398, 2017 A2376, CUTLER (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Act No. 2 |
2018-02-14 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2018-02-06 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2018-02-06 | House | Signed in Senate |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed in House |
2018-02-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (194-0) |
2018-02-05 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-12-13 | House | In the House |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-11-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-11-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-06-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-05-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-05-09 | House | First consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |