PA HB1174 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 23, 1970 (P.L.563, No.195), known as the Public Employe Relations Act, in public policy, further providing for declaration of intent; in definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in scope of bargaining, further providing for maintenance of membership and prohibiting collective bargaining agreements from requiring certain deductions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public policy, further providing for declaration of intent; in definitions, further providing for definitions; and, in scope of bargaining, further providing for maintenance of membership and prohibiting collective bargaining agreements from requiring certain deductions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00806 (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-21HouseReported as committed
2017-04-12HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback