PA HB1166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for rates of pilotage and computation, for pilotage fees and unit charge and for charges for services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for rates of pilotage and computation, for pilotage fees and unit charge and for charges for services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1166 PN 1344, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-05-08SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-05-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-07HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-06HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-04-09HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback