PA HB1162 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in special funds, providing for Public Safety and Protection Fund; and, in general budget implementation, further providing for Motor License Fund.
Title
In special funds, providing for Public Safety and Protection Fund; and, in general budget implementation, further providing for Motor License Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-22 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-17 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |