PA HB1154 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-25 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and providing for safekeeping.
Title
In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for sales by liquor licensees and restrictions, for prepared beverages and mixed drinks for off-premises consumption during disaster emergency and providing for safekeeping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1154 PN 1922, CONCUR (Y: 170 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1154 PN 1922, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Motion to Revert to Prior Printer's Number 1421 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Motion to Suspend Senate Rule 12 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1154 PN 1421, FP (Y: 187 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00910 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1154 PN 1922, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL (Y: 189 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Motion to Revert to Prior Printer's Number 1421 (Y: 21 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1154 PN 1844, Motion to Suspend Senate Rule 12 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1154 PN 1421, FP (Y: 187 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A00910 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (170-31) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2021-06-24 | House | Amended in House Committee on RULES |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-06-16 | House | In the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (26-24) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Motion to revert to Prior Printer's No. 1421 (21-29) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-05-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-05-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-14) |
2021-05-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-05-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-05-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-04 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-12 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |