PA HB1153 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-25 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 30 (Fish) and 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, providing for active duty military fishing reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual fishing license reciprocity; and,in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for active duty military hunting reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual hunting license reciprocity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fishing licenses, providing for active duty military fishing reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual fishing license reciprocity; and,in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for active duty military hunting reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual hunting license reciprocity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Game And Fisheries: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1153 PN 2085, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1153 PN 1376, 2017 A1996, ELLIS (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-25SenateReported as committed
2017-06-22SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2017-06-21SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2017-06-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-14HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-14HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-14HouseReported as committed
2017-04-12HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1153
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1153&pn=1376
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1153&pn=2085
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=18&theDate=06/14/2017&RollCallId=596
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=519
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=685
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=536
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=700
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=11&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1098

Bill Comments

feedback