PA HB1152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1152 PN 2165, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02307 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-24SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-24SenateReported as committed
2017-07-14SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-07-07SenateIn the Senate
2017-07-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-07-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-30HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-28HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-28HouseReported as amended
2017-04-12HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1152
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1152&pn=1375
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1152&pn=2165
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=766
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=767
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/30/2017&RollCallId=834
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=622
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=07/07/2017&RollCallId=839
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=09/24/2018&RollCallId=1077

Bill Comments

feedback