PA HB1152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.
Title
In particular rights and immunities, providing for rescue from motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1152 PN 2165, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02307 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1152 PN 2165, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02307 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-07-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-07-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-07-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-30 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-28 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |