PA HB1152 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-01 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act establishing the Department of Aging and Long-Term Living and providing for its powers and duties; and making related repeals.
Title
Establishing the Department of Aging and Long-Term Living and providing for its powers and duties; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-30 - House - HB 1152 PN 2212, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 110 N: 84 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 1152 PN 2094, 2009 A1728, PETRI (Y: 92 N: 102 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-17 - House - HB 1152 PN 2094, 2009 A1728, PETRI (Y: 92 N: 102 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH | |
2009-06-30 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-30 | Final passage | |
2009-06-25 | Third consideration | |
2009-06-17 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-10 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-10 | First consideration | |
2009-06-10 | Reported as amended | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |