PA HB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sexual offender treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sentencing, further providing for sexual offender treatment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1147 PN 1202, Final Passage-Reconsidered (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1147 PN 1202, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1147 PN 1202, FP (Y: 183 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateAct No. 45
2021-06-30SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25SenateSigned in Senate
2021-06-25SenateSigned in House
2021-06-25SenateFinal passage (49-1)
2021-06-25SenateVote on final passage reconsidered
2021-06-25SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2021-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2021-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-22SenateReported as committed
2021-05-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-05-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-18)
2021-05-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-04-08HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1147
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1147&pn=1202
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1147P1202.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2021/0/HB1147P1202.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/20/2021&RollCallId=334
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=241
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=485
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=399
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2021&RollCallId=438
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=244
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=251

Bill Comments

feedback