PA HB114 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.
Title
In public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 114 PN 90, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 114 PN 90, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-21 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |