PA HB1139 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on December 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-22 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in offenses against the family, further providing for newborn protection; in child protective services, further providing for taking child into protective custody; and, in newborn protection, further providing for definitions and for health care providers accepting newborns, providing for emergency services providers accepting newborns and for incubators for newborns and further providing for reporting acceptance of newborns, for immunity and for duties of department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In offenses against the family, further providing for newborn protection; in child protective services, further providing for taking child into protective custody; and, in newborn protection, further providing for definitions and for health care providers accepting newborns, providing for emergency services providers accepting newborns and for incubators for newborns and further providing for reporting acceptance of newborns, for immunity and for duties of department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1139 PN 2802, CONCUR (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1139 PN 2802, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1139 PN 1986, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01672 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-22HouseAct No. 68
2017-12-22HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-12-13HousePresented to the Governor
2017-12-13HouseSigned in Senate
2017-12-13HouseSigned in House
2017-12-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (188-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-12-12HouseReferred to RULES
2017-12-12HouseIn the House
2017-12-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-12-11SenateAmended on third consideration
2017-11-15SenateRemoved from table
2017-11-15SenateLaid on the table
2017-10-18SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-03SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-03SenateReported as amended
2017-06-22SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-06-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-0)
2017-06-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-19HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-13HouseReported as amended
2017-04-10HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1139
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1139&pn=1338
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1139&pn=1986
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1139&pn=2520
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1139&pn=2802
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=572
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=573
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/19/2017&RollCallId=672
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=510
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/20/2017&RollCallId=680
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=461
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=365
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1180
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=958

Bill Comments

feedback