PA HB1136 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |