PA HB1132 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-21 - Re-committed to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund to the Department of Labor and Industry and the Department of Community and Economic Development to provide for the expenses of administering the Workers' Compensation Act, The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act and the Office of Small Business Advocate for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015; and making an interfund transfer.
Title
Making appropriations from the Workmen's Compensation Administration Fund to the Department of Labor and Industry and the Department of Community and Economic Development to provide for the expenses of administering the Workers' Compensation Act, The Pennsylvania Occupational Disease Act and the Office of Small Business Advocate for the fiscal year July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2016, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2015; and making an interfund transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02338 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02338 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02338 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02338 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-25 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-23 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-23 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |