PA HB1123 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of January 28, 1988 (P.L.24, No.11), known as the Private Academic Schools Act, further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Academic Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for issuance and renewal of license, for directory of private academic schools, for requirements for licensure and operation, for enforcement, refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for promulgation of rules and regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for State Board of Private Academic Schools, for powers and duties of board, for application for license, for issuance and renewal of license, for directory of private academic schools, for requirements for licensure and operation, for enforcement, refusal, suspension or revocation of license and for promulgation of rules and regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-15 - House - HB 1123 PN 1372, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-24SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2013-05-15SenateIn the Senate
2013-05-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2013-05-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2013-05-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2013-05-13HouseSecond consideration
2013-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2013-04-24HouseLaid on the table
2013-04-24HouseFirst consideration
2013-04-24HouseReported as committed
2013-04-08HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback