PA HB1123 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-12 - Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
Pending: Senate Labor & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 11, 1972 (P.L.286, No.70), known as the Industrialized Housing Act, further providing for definitions and for regulations, insignia of certification required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for regulations, insignia of certification required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-05-06 - House - HB 1123 PN 1546, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-12 Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2009-05-06 In the Senate
2009-05-06 Third consideration and final passage
2009-05-05 Second consideration
2009-05-05 Re-reported as committed
2009-04-22 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2009-04-22 Removed from table
2009-04-21 Laid on the table
2009-04-21 First consideration
2009-04-21 Reported as amended
2009-03-26 Referred to LABOR RELATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback