PA HB1121 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 45676, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Yellow Creek in Hopewell Township, Bedford County, as the Colonel Joseph M. Stine Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 45676, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Yellow Creek in Hopewell Township, Bedford County, as the Colonel Joseph M. Stine Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1121 PN 1169, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1121 PN 1169, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-03SenateAct No. 5
2022-02-03SenateApproved by the Governor
2022-01-24SenatePresented to the Governor
2022-01-24SenateSigned in Senate
2022-01-24SenateSigned in House
2022-01-18SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-12-14SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-27SenateReported as committed
2021-09-28SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-09-28SenateIn the Senate
2021-09-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-09-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-09-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-09-27HouseSecond consideration
2021-09-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-05HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-05HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-05HouseReported as committed
2021-04-07HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1121
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1121&pn=1169
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1121P1169.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/05/2021&RollCallId=401
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/28/2021&RollCallId=875
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=495
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=409

Bill Comments

feedback