PA HB1120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Passed on November 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Act No. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 3937, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Bloody Run in Everett Borough, Bedford County, as the PFC James E. Williams Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 3937, carrying Pennsylvania Route 26 over Bloody Run in Everett Borough, Bedford County, as the PFC James E. Williams Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1120 PN 1168, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1120 PN 1168, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17SenateAct No. 86
2021-11-17SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-11-10SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-11-10SenateSigned in Senate
2021-11-10SenateSigned in House
2021-11-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-11-09SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-27SenateReported as committed
2021-09-28SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-09-28SenateIn the Senate
2021-09-28HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2021-09-28HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-09-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-09-27HouseSecond consideration
2021-09-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-05HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-05HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-05HouseReported as committed
2021-04-07HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1120
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1120&pn=1168
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1120P1168.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/05/2021&RollCallId=400
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/28/2021&RollCallId=874
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=494
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=369

Bill Comments

feedback