PA HB1118 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for conflicts of interest; and repealing and adding provisions relating to independent counsel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for conflicts of interest; and repealing and adding provisions relating to independent counsel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1118 PN 4066, CONCUR (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1118 PN 4066, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1118 PN 1965, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02713 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A02713 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-03HouseAct No. 131
2016-11-03HouseApproved by the Governor
2016-10-26HousePresented to the Governor
2016-10-25HouseSigned in Senate
2016-10-25HouseSigned in House
2016-10-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (193-0)
2016-10-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2016-10-25HouseReferred to RULES
2016-10-24HouseIn the House
2016-10-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-0)
2016-10-18SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2016-10-17SenateRe-reported as committed
2016-07-11SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2016-06-27SenateFirst consideration
2016-06-27SenateReported as amended
2015-07-10SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2015-06-30SenateIn the Senate
2015-06-30HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-1)
2015-06-30HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2015-06-29HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-27HouseRe-committed to RULES
2015-06-27HouseFirst consideration
2015-06-27HouseReported as amended
2015-05-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1118
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1118&pn=1462
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1118&pn=1965
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1118&pn=3640
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1118&pn=4066
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/27/2015&rNbr=706
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/27/2015&rNbr=705
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2015&rNbr=822
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=603
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/30/2015&rNbr=831
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/27/2015&RollCallId=705
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/27/2015&RollCallId=706
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/29/2015&RollCallId=822
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/30/2015&RollCallId=831
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/27/2016&RollCallId=914
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/17/2016&RollCallId=1093
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=707
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1847
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/25/2016&RollCallId=2249

Bill Comments 750

feedback