PA HB1110 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-29 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions applying to both liquor and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for limiting number of retail licenses to be issued in each county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-25 - House of Representatives - House Floor: HB 1110 PN 1440, FP (Y: 154 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House of Representatives - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House of Representatives - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House of Representatives - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House of Representatives - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - House of Representatives - House Floor: HB 1110 PN 1440, 2015 A1949, SANTARSIERO (Y: 86 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-22 - House of Representatives - House Floor: HB 1110 PN 1440, 2015 A2149, LAWRENCE (Y: 62 N: 133 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-08 - House of Representatives - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - House of Representatives - House Liquor Control: To Table (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-08 - House of Representatives - House Liquor Control: To Table (Y: 4 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-08 - House of Representatives - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-29SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2015-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2015-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (154-37)
2015-06-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-06-22HouseSecond consideration
2015-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-06-08HouseRe-committed to RULES
2015-06-08HouseFirst consideration
2015-06-08HouseReported as committed
2015-05-05HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1110
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1110&pn=1440
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/08/2015&rNbr=416
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/08/2015&rNbr=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=482
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=483
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2015&rNbr=589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/23/2015&rNbr=618
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=519
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/08/2015&RollCallId=415
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=06/08/2015&RollCallId=416
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2015&RollCallId=589
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/23/2015&RollCallId=618

Bill Comments

feedback