PA HB111 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00811 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00812 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00811 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00812 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-15 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-01 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |