PA HB111 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing integrated amendments to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, changing and adding provisions relating to selection of justices and judges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 111 PN 1699, 2017 A6310, MARSICO (Y: 184 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 111 PN 1699, 2017 A1205, DIAMOND (Y: 81 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 111 PN 1699, 2017 A1204, DIAMOND (Y: 86 N: 104 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 111 PN 1699, 2017 A1217, SAYLOR (Y: 109 N: 81 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01077 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01068 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-03-12HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-12HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-19HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-06-26HouseRemoved from table
2017-06-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-02-28HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=111
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0111&pn=0687
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0111&pn=1699
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0111&pn=3462
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=373
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=374
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=375
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1156
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1157
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1158
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1159
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/23/2018&RollCallId=1559

Bill Comments

feedback