PA HB1108 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-29 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 30 (Fish) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fishing licenses, further providing for exemptions from license requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1108 PN 1147, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-29SenateReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES
2021-12-15SenateIn the Senate
2021-12-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2021-12-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-12-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-12-14HouseSecond consideration
2021-11-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-11-09HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-22HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-22HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-21HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-21HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-21HouseReported as committed
2021-04-06HouseReferred to GAME AND FISHERIES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback