PA HB1107 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-7)
Status: Passed on November 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Act No. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the Faxon Interchange of Interstate 180 at Northway Road in Loyalsock Township, Lycoming County, as the Sgts. Thomas Woodruff, Sr., and Hamilton Woodruff Memorial Interchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the Faxon Interchange of Interstate 180 at Northway Road in Loyalsock Township, Lycoming County, as the Sgts. Thomas Woodruff, Sr., and Hamilton Woodruff Memorial Interchange.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1107 PN 1146, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1107 PN 1146, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17SenateAct No. 85
2021-11-17SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-11-10SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-11-10SenateSigned in Senate
2021-11-10SenateSigned in House
2021-11-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2021-11-09SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-27SenateReported as committed
2021-07-07SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-04-06HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1107
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1107&pn=1146
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1107P1146.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=430
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=450
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=791
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=368

Bill Comments

feedback