PA HB1107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-24 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, establishing the Pennsylvania Permitting Commission and providing for its powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Pennsylvania Permitting Commission and providing for its powers and duties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02748 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-09-24HouseSecond consideration
2019-09-23HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as amended
2019-04-29HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback