PA HB1106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-01 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, providing for environmental permits and plan approvals; making related repeals; and abrogating regulations.
Title
Providing for environmental permits and plan approvals; making related repeals; and abrogating regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-08 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-25 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-23 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |