PA HB1105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in realty transfer tax, further providing for definitions and for exempt parties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In realty transfer tax, further providing for definitions and for exempt parties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-02HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-02HouseLaid on the table
2018-01-23HouseRemoved from table
2018-01-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-10-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-13HouseReported as committed
2017-04-10HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback