PA HB1103 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 109 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 109 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1982 (P.L.1404, No.325), known as the Self-Service Storage Facility Act, further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.
Title
Further providing for owner's lien, for enforcement of lien, for notice, for advertisement of sale and for location of sale.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1103 PN 1140, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1103 PN 1140, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1103 PN 1140, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1103 PN 1140, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 109 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2022-04-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-06-21 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-21 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2021-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |