PA HB1103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-17 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-04-29HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback