PA HB1103 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications.
Title
In additional special funds, further providing for definitions, for use of funds, for amount of grant and for guidelines for applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to FINANCE |