PA HB110 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 21, 1988 (P.L.1036, No.116), known as the Hardwoods Development Council Act, further providing for Hardwoods Development Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for Hardwoods Development Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 110 PN 78, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-23SenateReported as committed
2021-02-05SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2021-02-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-04HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=110
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0110&pn=0078
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0110P0078.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=35
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=34
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/05/2021&RollCallId=105
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=64

Bill Comments

feedback