PA HB110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 110 PN 2778, FP (Y: 103 N: 83 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A04996 (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A00397 (Y: 16 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00397 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-13SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (103-83)
2017-12-05HouseRe-reported as amended
2017-12-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-04HouseSecond consideration
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-23HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-23HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-21HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=110
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0110&pn=0087
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0110&pn=1045
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0110&pn=2778
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=111
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/21/2017&RollCallId=112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1110
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1109
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=909
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=968

Bill Comments

feedback