PA HB11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Act No. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 92 from Apple Tree Road to Rustic Lane in Exeter Township, Luzerne County, as the Robert F. Kile, Sr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 13861, carrying State Route 1025 over State Route 1014 in East Pennsboro Township, Cumberland County, as the Senator Hal Mowery Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15986, on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the U.S. Marine Captain Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 16385 on the portion of State Route 4016, also known as West 38th Street, between Schaper Avenue and Pittsburgh Avenue over Interstate 79 in the City of Erie as the Major Tom Carr Memorial Bridge; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of Pennsylvania Route 92 from Apple Tree Road to Rustic Lane in Exeter Township, Luzerne County, as the Robert F. Kile, Sr., Memorial Highway; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 13861, carrying State Route 1025 over State Route 1014 in East Pennsboro Township, Cumberland County, as the Senator Hal Mowery Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 15986, on that portion of Interstate 79 northbound over West 16th Street in the City of Erie, Erie County, as the U.S. Marine Captain Thomas J. Kennedy, Jr., Memorial Bridge; designating the bridge identified as Bridge Key 16385 on the portion of State Route 4016, also known as West 38th Street, between Schaper Avenue and Pittsburgh Avenue over Interstate 79 in the City of Erie as the Major Tom Carr Memorial Bridge; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 872, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 11 PN 872, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 11 PN 7, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseAct No. 6
2021-03-23HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-03-23HousePresented to the Governor
2021-03-22HouseSigned in Senate
2021-03-22HouseSigned in House
2021-03-22HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2021-03-22HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-03-16HouseReferred to RULES
2021-03-15HouseIn the House
2021-03-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-03-15SenateAmended on third consideration
2021-02-23SenateSecond consideration
2021-02-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-02-22SenateReported as committed
2021-02-04SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-02-03SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-27HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-27HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-25HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=11
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0011&pn=0007
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0011&pn=0872
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0011P0007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=3
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=21
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/03/2021&RollCallId=94
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=02/22/2021&RollCallId=28
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=49
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=83
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=03/22/2021&RollCallId=161

Bill Comments

feedback